Skip to main content
Skip to main content
Essex.gov.uk
Home
>
Committees
Register
|
Login
Essex Pension Fund Strategy Board (PSB)
Committee Details
Description:
The PSB ensures that the administration of the (Local Government Pension Scheme) Essex Pension Fund and its Fund investments comply with the relevant regulations and legislation through the Investment Steering Committee (ISC).
Active:
04 June 2009 - onwards
Membership:
Fixed
Substitutions:
Nominated
Meetings
Members
Other Information
Meetings
Display meetings in date range
From:
September 2024
September 2024
week
M
T
W
T
F
S
S
35
26
27
28
29
30
31
1
36
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
37
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
38
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
39
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
40
30
1
2
3
4
5
6
*
*
To:
September 2024
September 2024
week
M
T
W
T
F
S
S
35
26
27
28
29
30
31
1
36
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
37
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
38
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
39
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
40
30
1
2
3
4
5
6
*
*
*
Meeting Date - Start Time : End Time
Venue
Status
Calendar
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
Page 7 of 7, Displaying meetings 61 to 64 of 64 meetings found in selected date range
25 September 2024 - 10:00 : 13:00
Committee Room 2
Scheduled
11 December 2024 - 10:00 : 13:00
Committee Room 2
Scheduled
19 March 2025 - 10:00 : 13:00
Committee Room 2
Scheduled
02 July 2025 - 10:00 : 13:00
Committee Room 2
Scheduled
Members
Committee Membership Filters
Members On:
September 2024
September 2024
week
M
T
W
T
F
S
S
35
26
27
28
29
30
31
1
36
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
37
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
38
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
39
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
40
30
1
2
3
4
5
6
*
*
Include Retired Members:
Party
Name
Role
Membership Dates
Attendance
Conservative Party
Mrs Susan Barker
Chairman
14/05/2013 - current
100%
Conservative Party
Alan Goggin
Member
10/05/2017 - current
96%
Conservative Party
Anthony Michael Hedley
Member
18/10/2017 - current
79%
Liberal Democrats
David King - Deputy Leader of Liberal Democrat Group
Member
25/05/2021 - current
64%
Conservative Party
Mark Platt
Member
04/07/2018 - current
86%
Conservative Party
Clive Souter
Member
25/05/2021 - current
88%
Independent
Wendy Stamp - Member of Non-Aligned Group
Member
14/05/2024 - current
No meetings since joining
Appointees
Appointee Name
Appointee Role
Appointee Membership Dates
Appointee Attendance
Catherine Calder
Member
01/06/2024 - current
No meetings since joining
Cllr Paul Collins (Southend)
Member
20/05/2024 - current
No meetings since joining
Rachel Hadley
Member
02/06/2020 - current
100%
Cllr Steve Liddiard (Thurrock)
Member
22/05/2024 - current
No meetings since joining
Brian Pereira (UNISON)
Member
01/04/2024 - current
No meetings since joining
Substitutes
Substitute Party
Substitute Name
Substitute Role
Substitute Membership Dates
Substitute Meetings Attended
Conservative Party
Mark Durham - Cabinet Member for The Arts, Heritage and Culture
Substitute
01/05/2020 - current
2
Conservative Party
Dan Land
Substitute
14/05/2024 - current
0
Liberal Democrats
Michael John Mackrory JP - Leader of Liberal Democrat Group
Substitute
25/05/2021 - current
2
Committee Clerk
Name:
Amanda Crawford
Email Address:
amanda.crawford@essex.gov.uk
Telephone:
03330 321763
Other Information
Committees
Essex Parking Partnership
Calendar of Meetings
Councillors
Councillor Search
Decisions
Forward Plan
Elections
Outside Bodies
Petitions
Scrutiny Information
Essex Police, Fire and Crime Panel
Document Search
Committee and Democracy related Documents
Written Questions to Cabinet Members
Committees No Longer Active
Print this page